COCINAS SURESTE SL
Company details
- Active NIF/CIF: B03081098
-
-
-
-
Address: Not available
-
-
Featured products:
More information on COCINAS SURESTE SL
-
MELENDEZ OLIVA ERIKA.DesconocidoTermination of employment: 08/08/2024
-
MELENDEZ OLIVA RAFAELDesconocidoAppointment: 08/08/2024
-
MELENDEZOLIVA CARLOS.DesconocidoAppointment: 08/08/2024
-
MELENDEZ TARI RAFAEL.DesconocidoTermination of employment: 05/04/2022
-
MELENDEZ OLIVARAFAELDesconocidoAppointment: 05/04/2022
-
MELENDEZ OLIVA ERIKADesconocidoAppointment: 05/04/2022
-
MELENDEZ OLIVA CARLOS.DesconocidoAppointment: 05/04/2022
-
CORTES ARNAU JOSE LUISAdministrador únicoTermination of employment: 08/10/1998
-
MELENDEZ TARI RAFAELAdministrador únicoAppointment: 13/07/2011
-
BROTONS BONET FRANCISCO JOSEApoderadoAppointment: 14/07/2011Termination of employment: 31/10/2012
-
08/08/2024 | BORME act no.: 349713 | Register: ALICANTE/ALACANTReelecciones
-
08/08/2024 | BORME act no.: 349713 | Register: ALICANTE/ALACANTCeses/Dimisiones
-
05/04/2022 | BORME act no.: 149938 | Register: ALICANTE/ALACANTOtros conceptos
-
05/04/2022 | BORME act no.: 149938 | Register: ALICANTE/ALACANTCeses/Dimisiones
-
05/04/2022 | BORME act no.: 149938 | Register: ALICANTE/ALACANTNombramientos
-
05/04/2022 | BORME act no.: 149938 | Register: ALICANTE/ALACANTModificaciones estatutarias
-
31/10/2012 | BORME act no.: 445114 | Register: ALICANTERevocaciones
-
14/07/2011 | BORME act no.: 294998 | Register: ALICANTENombramientos
-
13/07/2011 | BORME act no.: 293651 | Register: ALICANTENombramientos
-
13/07/2011 | BORME act no.: 293651 | Register: ALICANTECeses/Dimisiones
Other information
The CIF assigned to COCINAS SURESTE SL is B03081098, and its business status is active. The company is engaged in an economic activity classified within the CNAE 3102 - Fabricación de muebles de cocina. In addition, its SIC identification 2431 - Carpintería mecánica also defines it.
COCINAS SURESTE SL employs a team of Between 10 and 49 employees and generates an annual turnover of less than 2 million euros. The company is registered in the Mercantile Registry of Alicante/alacant, and has 11 executive positions. Its most recent announcement in the Borme was published on 08/08/2024, while its last deposit of ordinary annual accounts is for the 2022 fiscal year.
To access the contact information of COCINAS SURESTE SL, such as the telephone number, postal address, or website, visit the Company Data module.
If you require more details about COCINAS SURESTE SL, we invite you to consult one of our available financial reports, the company's Annual Accounts, or to check its payment incidents in the RAI delinquency file.
The financial, business, and legal information provided about COCINAS SURESTE SL is extracted from official sources and is updated daily.
Do you want to know more about COCINAS SURESTE SL??
Find out more about this company by consulting these reports: